CA AB521 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 118600 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 6722 to the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety and health.
Title
Occupational safety and health standards: construction jobsites: toilet facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 521 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB521 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 521 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB521 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 521 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3384.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2639.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2023-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1693.) |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1557.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 118600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6722 | New Code | See Bill Text |