CA AB529 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 786 of, and to add Section 786.5 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: sealing of records.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 529 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB529 Mark Stone By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 529 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB529 Mark Stone By Wiener (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 529 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 3367.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2764.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 6). |
2017-05-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 22. Page 1303.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 26). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 786 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 786.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |