CA AB530 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11346.2, 11346.3, and 11346.5 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Regulations: economic and technical information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11346.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11346.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 11346.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 9147.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |