CA AB530 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3001 of, and to add Section 3007.8 to, the Elections Code, relating to vote by mail ballots.
Title
Vote by mail ballots: telephone applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB530 Quirk-Silva By Torres (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 530 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 530 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading Amend By HAGMAN Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 530 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 530 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading Amend By HAGMAN Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By ATKINS (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 501, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-03 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1992.). |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1809.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 1835.) |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1721.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 7). |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3007.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |