CA AB539 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11106, 29810, 29825, 29850, and 33870 of, and to add Section 29830 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearm possession: prohibitions: transfer to licensed dealer.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB539 Pan By Knight (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 539 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB539 Pan By Knight (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 539 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 539 PAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB539 Pan By Knight (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 539 PAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3328.). |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2400.). |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Joint Rule 61(a)(13) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2376.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2388.) |
2013-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2238.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1792.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29825 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 29830 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 33870 | Amended Code | Citation Text |