CA AB539 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 708, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 708, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22202, 22250, 22251, 22305, 22334, 22452, 22453, 22454, 22456, 22463, and 22464 of, and to add Sections 22304.5 and 22307.5 to, the Financial Code, relating to consumer loans.
Title
California Financing Law: consumer loans: charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB539 Limón et al. By Mitchell (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 539 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 539 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 539 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 539 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 708, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 3553.). |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 2913.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 4. Page 1869.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22304.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22307.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22334 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22453 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22463 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22464 | Amended Code | Citation Text |