CA AB560 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3339.5 to the Civil Code, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: immigration status.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Asm. Patty Lopez [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Anthony Rendon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - AB 560 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB560 Gomez By Hueso (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - AB 560 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB560 Gomez By Hueso (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - AB 560 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 151, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 2414.). |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 1898.). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 16). |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 1140.) |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 14). |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3339.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |