CA AB567 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19323 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend and renumber Sections 7076, 7076.1, 7076.2, 7076.3, 7076.4, 7077, and 7078 of, and to add Article 2.1 (commencing with Section 7077) to Chapter 8 of Part 1 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to medical cannabis.
Title
Medical cannabis: regulation and taxation amnesty.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 567 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB567 Gipson By McGuire (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 567 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB567 Gipson By McGuire (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 567 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6463.). |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 5289.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 13). |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and GOV. & F. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c) . |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 8). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 1625.) |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (May 14). |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1369.) |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |