CA AB571 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5911 and 5913 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agricultural pest control, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Agricultural pest control: citrus disease prevention.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB571 Gatto By Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 571 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 571 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2014-01-06 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2013-10-07 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2249.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1672.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 5911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 5913 | Amended Code | Citation Text |