CA AB571 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65915.1 to the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Planning and zoning: density bonuses: affordable housing.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 571 Mayes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB571 Mayes By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 571 Mayes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB571 Mayes By Ochoa Bogh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 571 Mayes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 346, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2905.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.) |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2463.). |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1655.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65915.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |