CA AB574 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 367, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 367, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1231.5, 1343.1, 1367.63, 1580.1, 1734.5, and 100315 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 14002.5, 14005.12, 14041.1, 14091.3, 14105.19, 14105.191, 14115.75, 14131.10, 14167.1, 14168.1, and 14182 of, and to add Chapter 8.75 (commencing with Section 14591) to, and to repeal Chapter 8.75 (commencing with Section 14590) of, Part 3 of Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to the elderly.
Title
Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-02 - Assembly - AB 574 LOWENTHAL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB574 Bonnie Lowenthal By Strickland (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 574 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB574 Bonnie Lowenthal By Strickland (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 574 LOWENTHAL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 367, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2011-09-02 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2853.). | |
2011-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2165.). | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-07 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-05-31 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1670.) | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-04 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-03-24 | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | |
2011-03-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and HEALTH. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |