CA AB591 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 1048 and 17407.7 to the Education Code, relating to school property.
Title
School property: lease: county boards of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB591 O'Donnell By Hueso (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 591 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - AB 591 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 1935.). |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 7). |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 1417.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1373.) |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 22). |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1048 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 17407.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 17407.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |