CA AB591 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 71265, 71266, and 71267 of the Water Code, relating to municipal water districts.
Title
Central Basin Municipal Water District: board of directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - AB 591 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB591 Cristina Garcia By Gonzalez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 591 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB591 Cristina Garcia By Gonzalez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 591 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 124, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2562.). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1869.). |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1395.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 71265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 71266 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 71267 | Amended Code | Citation Text |