CA AB591 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 57, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 57, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 40303.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vessels.
Title
Vessels: arrests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB591 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 591 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - AB 591 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 57, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1632.). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1153.) |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 40303.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |