CA AB594 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 8.6 (commencing with Section 9780) to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to aging and adult services.
Title
California Department of Aging and Adult Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 9780 | New Code | See Bill Text |