CA AB60 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 25401.8 to the Public Resources Code, relating to water conservation.
Title
Water conservation: water meters: accuracy standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25401.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |