CA AB610 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9401 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: local bond measures: tax rate statement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [06-26-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 610 Obernolte Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 610 Obernolte Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 1624.) |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |