CA AB631 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 337, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 337, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 338.1 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 3224, 3236, and 3236.5 of, and to add Sections 3224.5, 3236.2, 3236.3, and 3236.6 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: enforcement: penalties.
Sponsors
Asm. Gregg Hart [D] | Asm. Dawn Addis [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 631 Hart Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB631 Hart et al. By Allen (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 631 Hart Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB631 Hart et al. By Allen (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 631 Hart Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 337, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 3415.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2633.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB S. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 19. Page 2063.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 25). |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 338.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3224 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3224.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3236 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3236.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3236.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3236.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3236.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |