CA AB64 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 705 to the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 25740.5, 25742, 25746, 25747, and 25751 of, and to add Section 25500.1 to, the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 399.2.5 and 454.5 of, to add Sections 399.13, 399.26, and 1005.1 to, and to repeal and add Section 399.14 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: renewable energy resources: generation and
Sponsors
Asm. Karen Bass [D] | Asm. Felipe Fuentes [D] | Asm. Paul Krekorian [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Sen. Joseph Simitian [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-12 - Assembly - AB 64 KREKORIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB64 Krekorian By Simitian (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 64 KREKORIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB64 Krekorian By Simitian (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 64 KREKORIAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2009-09-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 3408.) | |
2009-09-11 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2428.) | |
2009-09-10 | Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Page 2380.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (September 10). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2009-09-09 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-09-08 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-09-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-31 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27). (received by desk August 28, 2009 pursuant to JR61(a)(11)) | |
2009-08-17 | In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file. | |
2009-07-14 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 5.) (July 7). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and RLS. | |
2009-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 31. Page 2067.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-05-05 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-27 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-20 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-03-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-19 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2009-03-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2008-12-16 | Read first time. | |
2008-12-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. | |
2008-12-09 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 705 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25500.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25740.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25742 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25746 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25747 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25751 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1005.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |