CA AB69 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-03 - Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-03 - Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38576 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: market-based compliance mechanisms: exemption.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] |
Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] | Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Sen. Norma Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Assembly - AB 69 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on AGRI. and E.Q. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 917.) |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 10). |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 14611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 14615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 14690 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116765 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38576 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13169.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13444 | New Code | See Bill Text |