CA AB709 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13300 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal history information.
Title
Criminal history information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 709 McKinnor Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB709 McKinnor et al. By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - AB 709 McKinnor Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB709 McKinnor et al. By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Assembly - AB 709 McKinnor Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3467.). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 13). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3322.) |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.) |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2585.). |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2023-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1273.) |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |