CA AB723 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 50833, 51335, and 51340 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Housing: finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 723 CHIU Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Chiu By Beall Urgency Claus (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 723 RENDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Chiu By Beall Urgency Claus (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 723 RENDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 552, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6424.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) . |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6225.) |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5264.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Measure version as amended on July 16 corrected. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 14). |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1817.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1101.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1101.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 17921.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 17921.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50833 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 51335 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 51340 | Amended Code | Citation Text |