CA AB723 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-09 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-09 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12804.9 of the Vehicle Code, relating to driver’s licenses.
Title
Foreign driver’s licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] |
Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Low et al. By Portantino (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Low et al. By Portantino Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Low et al. By Portantino (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 723 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Low et al. By Portantino Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB723 Low et al. By Portantino (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 723 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2499.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2299.) |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Portantino. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2299.). |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1793.) |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Low. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Low. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2021-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12804.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |