CA AB728 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13405 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: financial reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 728 HADLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB728 Hadley By Morrell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - AB 728 HADLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB728 Hadley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 728 HADLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB728 Hadley By Morrell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - AB 728 HADLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB728 Hadley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Assembly - AB 728 HADLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2810.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2333.). |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly concurred in Senate amendments. Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2355.). |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1878.). |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1348.) |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13887.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |