CA AB766 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66021.5 to the Education Code, and to amend Section 11402 of, and to add Section 11402.7 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster youth: students of the California State University and California Community Colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 766 FRIEDMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB766 Friedman By Mitchell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 766 FRIEDMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB766 Friedman By Mitchell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 766 FRIEDMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 710, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3293.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3254.) |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2705.). |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1391.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66021.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 76300.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 89713 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11402.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |