CA AB771 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 206, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 206, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1368 of, and to add Section 1368.2 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: requests for documents:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-15 - Assembly - AB 771 BUTLER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB771 Butler (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 771 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB771 Butler (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 771 BUTLER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 206, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-08-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-08-15 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2385.). | |
2011-07-14 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-07-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1865.). | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-06-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1552.) | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1498.) | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1368 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1368.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |