CA AB774 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1277 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: licensure.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-04-13 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-12 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 5). | |
2011-03-29 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1277 | Amended Code | Citation Text |