CA AB776 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14186.1, 14186.36, and 14186.4 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Assembly - AB 776 YAMADA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB776 Yamada By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 776 YAMADA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB776 Yamada By Leno (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 776 YAMADA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Aging and Long (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 298, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2583.). |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1860.). |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1477.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14186.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14186.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14186.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |