CA AB787 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.57 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal-state gaming compacts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 787 CHESBRO Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB787 Chesbro Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 787 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB787 Chesbro Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 787 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 340, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:25 a.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6378.). | |
2012-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4752.). | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-08-08 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-07-06 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-07 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.) | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2860 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2864.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 12012.45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.57 | New Code | See Bill Text |