CA AB787 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 366.31, 391, 727, 11363, 11400, 11403, 16120, 16501.1, and 16507.6 of, and to add Section 388.1 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 787 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB787 Stone By Yee (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 787 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB787 Stone By Yee (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Assembly - AB 787 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 487, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3299.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2356.). |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1478.) |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11363 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16507.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 388 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 388.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 391 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 727 | Amended Code | Citation Text |