CA AB809 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 51290) to Chapter 2 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: Cyber Secure Youth Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - AB 809 QUIRK-SILVA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and V.A. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3867.) |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51290 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66025.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 78261.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 78261.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |