CA AB816 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12200, 12238, 12243, 12253, 12310, 12404, 12420, 12431, 12460, 12461, 12530, 12653, and 25100 of, to amend the heading of Part 2 (commencing with Section 12200) of Division 3 of Title 1 of, and to add Sections 12201.5, 12228.3, 12230.5, 12253.5, 12310.5, 12317, 12404.5, 12454.5, 12460.5, 12530.5, and 12656.5 to, the Corporations Code, relating to cooperative corporations.
Title
Cooperative corporations: worker cooperatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Assembly - AB 816 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB816 Bonta By Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 816 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB816 Bonta By Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 816 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2416.). |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1906.). |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 1551.) |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 13). |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 27). |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |