CA AB82 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12804.9 and 12804.11 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Vehicles: firefighting equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB82 Jeffries (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 82 JEFFRIES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 82 JEFFRIES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 92, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. | |
2011-07-01 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1688.). | |
2011-06-28 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-04-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 981.). | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-02-24 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-02-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-01-05 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 4. | |
2011-01-04 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12804.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12804.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |