CA AB837 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14105 of, to add Sections 14105.2 and 14227.5 to, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 13500) to Division 13 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
No party preference voters: partisan primary elections.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 837 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB837 Low By Allen (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 837 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB837 Low By Allen (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 837 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 3136.). |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2571.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 1541.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10). |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 14105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14105.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 14227.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 14228 | New Code | See Bill Text |