CA AB841 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 285 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Telecommunications: universal service: Voice over
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB841 Buchanan Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 841 BUCHANAN Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - AB 841 BUCHANAN Third Reading Urgency (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 685, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-29 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-29 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2077.). | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11). | |
2011-06-21 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-01 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1704.). | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-24 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Measure version as amended on May 11 corrected. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2011-05-09 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-05-05 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-04 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 285 | New Code | See Bill Text |