CA AB85 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.37 to, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 127380) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 107 of, the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10123.52 to the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14132.14 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health.
Title
Social determinants of health: screening and outreach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - AB 85 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB85 Weber By Hurtado (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 85 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB85 Weber By Hurtado (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 85 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-07 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 1. Page 3556.). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2761.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1). |
2023-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 1791.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2022-12-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 16. |
2022-12-16 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |