CA AB890 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21080.37 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the environment.
Title
Environment: CEQA exemption: roadway improvement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Assembly - AB 890 OLSEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB890 Olsen By Berryhill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 890 OLSEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB890 Olsen By Berryhill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Assembly - AB 890 OLSEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6625.). | |
2012-08-29 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 4943.). | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Simitian. | |
2012-08-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-08-08 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2). | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-01-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 9. Page 3595.) | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-19 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-17 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-13 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-01-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9). | |
2012-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-05-02 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-03-30 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-03-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | |
2011-02-22 | Measure version as introduced on February 17 corrected. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |