CA AB896 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 205, 655, 2545, 2546.9, 2556.2, 2567, 2568, and 3077 of, to add Section 205.3 to, and to add and repeal Section 3070.2 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Registered Dispensing Opticians: Dispensing Opticians Fund: Optometry Fund: mobile optometric offices.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 896 Low Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB896 Low et al. By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 896 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB896 Low et al. By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, that the measure be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 896 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5429.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13) |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2020-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 205.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2546.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2556.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2567 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2568 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3070.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3077 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 655 | Amended Code | Citation Text |