CA AB897 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 87482.3 and 87482.5 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: part-time employees.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 897 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3905.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 87482.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87482.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |