CA AB90 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 695, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 695, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 70615 of the Government Code, to add Section 186.36 to, and to repeal and add Sections 186.34 and 186.35 of, the Penal Code, relating to criminal gangs.
Title
Criminal gangs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 90 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 42 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB90 Weber et al. By Mitchell (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 90 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB90 Weber et al. By Mitchell (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 90 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 695, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 3391.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2852.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 36. Page 2070.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1775.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 1755.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 70615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13519.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |