CA AB919 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1.6 (commencing with Section 1102.50) to Chapter 2 of Title 4 of Part 4 of Division 2 of, and to add Section 2923.56 to, the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Residential real property: sale of rental properties: right of first offer.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Liz Ortega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1102.50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB919 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB919#99INT |