CA AB931 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1385 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Sentencing: dismissal of enhancements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 931 Villapudua Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 931 Villapudua Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1774.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2021-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |