CA AB957 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3011 of the Family Code, relating to family law.
Title
Family law: gender identity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-08 - Assembly - AB 957 Wilson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB957 Wilson et al. By Umberg (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - AB 957 Wilson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB957 Wilson et al. By Umberg (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Assembly - AB 957 Wilson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-09-22 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 3123.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2402.). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 13). |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 13. Page 998.) |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 21). |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 3011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |