CA AB980 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-15 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-15 - In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 41320.4 to the Education Code, relating to school finance.
Title
Emergency apportionments: repayment: charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-15 - Senate - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 980 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 980 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-15 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-07-07 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 31. Page 1607.) | |
2009-05-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 29). | |
2009-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-22 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 15). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |