CA ABX18 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on January 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-06 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-06 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14491, 17550.19, and 21653 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 5305 of the Financial Code, to amend Section 421 of the Military and Veterans Code, to amend Sections 154, 155, 337.4, 368, 422.7, 476a, 484b, 484g, 484h, 487, 487b, 487e, 487f, 487h, 496, 498, 500, 502, 537, 537e, 550, 551, 565, 566, 592, 594.4, 641.3, 2932, 2933.1, 2933.2, 2933.3, 2933.5, 2933.6, 3000, 4019, and 4600 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 2933.4 of, to add Sections 2933.05 and 3060.95, and to repeal Section 2933 of, the Penal Code, to amend Sections 14591 and 41955 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 10851.5 and 42002.4 of the Vehicle Code, and to amend Sections 10980 and 15656 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation.
Title
Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2008-12-18 - Assembly - AB8 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By EVANS First Extraordinary Session (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2008-12-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB8 Budget Committee Ducheny (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2008-12-08 - Assembly - AB8 EVANS Assembly Third Reading First Extraordinary Session (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2008-12-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB8 Budget Committee Ducheny (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2008-12-08 - Assembly - AB8 EVANS Assembly Third Reading First Extraordinary Session (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-06 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-01-06 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:25 p.m. | |
2008-12-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 46.) | |
2008-12-18 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 23.). Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 23.) Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 25.) | |
2008-12-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2008-12-09 | From printer. | |
2008-12-08 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2008-12-08 | Read first time. To print. Art. IV, Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution suspended. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 8.) Read second time. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 14.) |