CA ABX19 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-12 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-12 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10752.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Taxation: vehicle license fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-12 | Died at Desk. | |
2011-01-03 | Read first time. | |
2010-12-14 | From printer. | |
2010-12-13 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 10752.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=abx1_9&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/abx1_9_bill_20101213_introduced.html |