CA ABX22 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to social services.
Title
Medi-Cal and developmental services: funding: rates.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Assembly - AB2 BONTA Assembly Third Reading Second Extraordinary Session (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 58.) |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 51.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |