CA ACA11 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 10 to Article XII thereof, and by repealing and adding Article XII thereof, relating to public utilities.
Title
Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - Assembly - ACA 11 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E. & C.A. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 9. Page 5232.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 9. |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |