CA ACA5 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-31 - From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-31 - From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 8 and 10 of Article II thereof, relating to initiatives.
Title
Initiatives: state general obligation bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-31 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 27). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-07-15 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-14 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-07-13 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). | |
2009-06-24 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-17 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-06-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-20 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2008-12-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 15. Read first time. | |
2008-12-15 | Introduced. To print. |