CA ACA5 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by adding Section 32 to Article I thereof, relating to abortion.
Title
Abortion: parental notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Refused adoption. |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P., HEALTH and APPR. |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |